ENGR. H. B. NO. 1892 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 1892 By: Boatman and Lawson of the House and Weaver of the Senate An Act relating to human trafficking and child exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation; providing for membership and appointments; stating duty to study human trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma; providing for recommendations and report; stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; setting term for task force ; providing travel reimbursements; providing for noncodification; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: A. There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation. There shall be twelve (12) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 1. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, or a designee; 2. The Attorney General, or a designee; ENGR. H. B. NO. 1892 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. The Chair of the District Attorneys Council, or a designee; 4. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control, or a designee; 5. The Director of the Oklahoma Department of Human Services, or a designee; 6. The Executive Director of the Office of Juvenile Affairs, or a designee; 7. The Commissioner of the Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Ser vices, or a designee; 8. The Commissioner of the State Department of Health, or a designee; 9. The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Association of Chiefs of Police, or a designee; 10. The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association, or a designee; 11. The President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate, or a designee; and 12. The Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives, or a designee. B. The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human trafficking, prostitution an d child exploitation in Oklahoma. The Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, ENGR. H. B. NO. 1892 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in identifying and interrupting websites that promote pornography and sexually explicit materials; and methods that develop and support community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse or prevent human trafficking, prostitution, sexual abuse or other factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution or child exploitation. C. The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by August 1, 2021. The Advisory Task Force shal l begin meeting and continue studying until January 1, 2022. A report of the findings and recommendations shall be presented to the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives and the Governor o n or before February 1, 2022. Upon delivery of the report, the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. D. Members of the Legislature shall receive travel reimbursements from their respective appointing authority. E. Staff of the Oklahoma State Senate and Oklahoma House of Representatives shall jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task Force. F. A Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 1, 2021. The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by majority vote of the members . SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. ENGR. H. B. NO. 1892 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof t his act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. Passed the House of Representatives the 3rd day of March, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021. Presiding Officer of the Senate