Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |