Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021