House
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Nollan
|
|
|