Senate | 03/31/2022 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Strom |