Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1989 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 02/25/2021

                             
 
HB1989 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 1989 	By: Caldwell (Trey) 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to agriculture; amending 2 O.S. 20 11, 
Section 8-22, which relates to seed labels; requiring 
genetically engineered cotton seed labels contain 
certain information; establishing minimum warm 
germination percentage for genetically engineered 
cotton seed; providing exception; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     2 O.S. 2011, Section 8 -22, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 8-22.  A.  Each bag, container, package, or bulk of 
agricultural seed transported, sold, offered for sale, or exposed 
for sale by any person within the State of Oklahoma for planting 
purposes, shall have, bear, or have attached in a conspicuous place, 
a plainly written or printed label or tag giving the following 
information, which shall not be modified or disclaimed in the 
labeling on the bag or container.   
 
HB1989 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  For treated seed, separate labeling shall show: 
1.  A word or statement that the seed has been treated; 
2.  The name or "coined name" of the treatment; 
3.  If harmful, the label must show the statement "Not to be 
Used for Feed or Food", and if poisonous materials are used, the 
label must show a caution statement stating words "Poison Treated". 
C.  For agricultural seeds separate labeling shall show: 
1.  Commonly accepted name as to kind, or kind and variety, of 
each agricultural seed component in excess of five percent (5%) of 
the whole.  If more than one component is present in excess of five 
percent (5%) of the whole, the word "mixture" or "mixed" shall be 
shown conspicuously on the tag or label; 
2.  Net weight; 
3.  Lot number or other lot identification; 
4.  Origin, including state or foreign country where grown.  If 
the origin is unknown, that fact shall be stated; 
5.  Percentage pure seed; 
6.  Percentage by weight of inert matter; 
7.  Percentage by weight of agricultural seed, other than the 
one required to be named on the label (designated as "other crop 
seed"); 
8.  Percentage by weight of all weed seeds; 
9.  The name and rate of occurrence of each kind of restricted 
noxious weed seed per pound when present in any amount;   
 
HB1989 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
10.  For each named agricultural seed: 
a. percentage of germination, exclusive of hard seed, 
b. percentage of hard seed, if present, and 
c. the calendar month and year the test was complete d to 
determine percentages; 
 11.  Following (A) and (B), above, the "total germination and 
hard seed" may be stated if desired; and 
12.  Name and address of the person or vendor who labeled the 
seed or who sells, offers, or exposes the seed for sale within the 
state. 
D.  For vegetable seeds labeling shall show: 
1.  Net weight; 
2.  Name of kind and variety of seed; and 
3.  For seeds which germinate less than the standard last 
established by the State Board of Agriculture: 
a. percentage of germination, exclus ive of hard seed, 
b. percentage of hard seed, if present, 
c. the calendar month and year the test was completed to 
determine the percentages, 
d. the words "below standard" in not less than 
eight-point type, and 
e. name and address of the person who labels th e seed, or 
who sells, offers, or exposes the seed for sale within 
this state.   
 
HB1989 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  For coated seed.  In addition to the required labeling for 
agricultural and vegetable seeds, when the seeds have been coated, 
labeling shall show: 
1.  A word statement that s eeds have been coated; and 
2.  Percentage by weight of inert coating material. 
F.  Beginning January 1, 2024, and until January 1, 2027, in 
addition to the required labeling requirements under this section, 
when cotton seeds have been genetically engineere d, labeling shall 
show the percentage of warm germination. Beginning January 1, 2024, 
and until January 1, 2027, it shall be unlawful for any person 
within this state to sell genetically engineered cotton seed that 
does not meet a minimum eighty -five percent (85%) standard of warm 
germination, unless the purchaser of the seed acknowledges in 
writing the warm germination rate of less than eighty -five percent 
(85%) 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE AND RURAL DEVELOPMENT, 
dated 02/24/2021 - DO PASS, As Amended.