Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |