Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Motion expired | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Fetgatter | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 24; Ayes: 61 Nays: 24 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |