Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021