House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Fugate, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|