House
|
03/31/2021
|
Approved by Governor 03/31/2021
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Withdrawn from Education committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 30
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Echols, ODonnell, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|