Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Simpson, Allen, Rader, Thompson, Rosino, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell
|
|
|