Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Luttrell | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jech | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Boles | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell |