Senate | 03/24/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Motion expired | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hilbert | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 42; Ayes: 62 Nays: 34 | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |