Senate | 03/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Technology | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |