Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021