Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 23, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021