House
|
04/22/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Rader
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Manger, Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Moore, Pae, Davis, Boles, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hilbert, Roberts (Dustin), Hill, Frix, Fetgatter
|
|
|