Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Motion expired | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative May | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 37; Ayes: 64 Nays: 29 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative May |