House | 03/10/2021 | Motion expired | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative May | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 60 | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative May | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |