House
|
05/18/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/18/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson, Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 34; Ayes: 69 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Grego
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|