House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|