Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021