House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Frix
|
|
|