Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Lawson |