House
|
04/22/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|