Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hamilton | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Roberts (Sean) | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Steagall |