Senate | 04/07/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 30 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Conley | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Steagall |