Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Boatman | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Lawson |