Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021