Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021