House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Davis
|
|
|