Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Simpson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Simpson; authored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 37
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Boles, McEntire, Hasenbeck, Roe, Wallace, Talley, Bush
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Sterling
|
|
|