House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 48 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 63 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sterling | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 47 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Sterling | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |