Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021