House
|
05/04/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Russ
|
|
|