Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Nichols |