House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|