Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021