House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Frix
|
|
|