House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|