House
|
05/27/2021
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named David, Daniels, Leewright, Paxton, Floyd, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|