Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2649 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 3, 2021