Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lowe (Dick) | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Echols |