House
|
04/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Bell
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|