House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Thompson, Rader, Hall, Rosino, Hicks, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|