House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 29; Ayes: 68 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Bell
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|