Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021