Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Ford |