House
|
05/05/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Withdrawn from County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Ford
|
|
|